Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/30/2019 at 05:50:21 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS LARRY LASLEY

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against LARRY LASLEY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6479

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

LARRY LASLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Hoffman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Judgment Against Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Non-Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Non-Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: LARRY LASLEY, Amount: $905.04, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: LARRY LASLEY, Amount: $143.50, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less