This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/30/2019 at 09:25:28 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS KRISTINA ORTEGA

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against KRISTINA ORTEGA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0746

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

KRISTINA ORTEGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Leroy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Release Of Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: KRISTINA ORTEGA, Amount: $619.03, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: KRISTINA ORTEGA, Amount: $162.00, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.