This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 09:28:36 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS JUAN CASTILLO

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JUAN CASTILLO. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, West Mcdowell Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Torres Carrillo, Rachel and Ramirez Lopez, Teresa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9594

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Mcdowell Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Torres Carrillo, Rachel

Ramirez Lopez, Teresa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JUAN CASTILLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Balsino

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Subpoena duces tecum, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: JUAN CASTILLO, Amount: $1,370.20, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: JUAN CASTILLO, Amount: $143.50, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less