This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/17/2019 at 07:43:34 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS JR RILEY

Case Summary

On 12/09/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JR RILEY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2335

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JR RILEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Alternative Method of Service, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: JR RILEY, Amount: $3,171.67, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: JR RILEY, Amount: $226.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less