This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 08:01:22 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC VS John Traichal

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 Midland Funding LLC filed an Other lawsuit against John Traichal. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9960

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

John Traichal

Garnishee

Oakwood Worldwide Sales And Service Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon Holub

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Judgment For: Midland Funding LLC Judgment Against: John Traichal, Amount: $1,033.35, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Judgment For: Midland Funding LLC Judgment Against: John Traichal, Amount: $190.00, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.