This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 10:33:52 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC VS Gail Pauly

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 Midland Funding LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Gail Pauly. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2392

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Gail Pauly

Garnishee

Dynamite Therapy, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shannon Vandergaw

Shannon Fowler

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Judgment For: Midland Funding LLC Judgment Against: Gail Pauly, Amount: $596.42, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Judgment For: Midland Funding LLC Judgment Against: Gail Pauly, Amount: $162.00, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.