This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 10:34:05 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC VS Eric Olsen

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 Midland Funding LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Eric Olsen. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2397

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Eric Olsen

Garnishee

SUBMARINO'S GLENDALE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shannon Vandergaw

Shannon Fowler

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Summary, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Summary Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Mediation, Sub Type: Disclosure and Confidentiality Agreement, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Mediation, Sub Type: Outcome Notice, Result: Defendant Failed to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Notice of Service Re 26.1 Disclosure, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Waive Appearance of Real Party in Interest, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Judgment For: Midland Funding LLC Judgment Against: Eric Olsen, Amount: $610.62, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Judgment For: Midland Funding LLC Judgment Against: Eric Olsen, Amount: $162.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.