Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/15/2019 at 23:08:34 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC VS Edgar Barrera

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Edgar Barrera. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0498

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

Defendant

Edgar Barrera

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Bursey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Hearing Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Hearing Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Hearing Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Debtor, Sub Type: Hearing Request, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Debtor, Sub Type: Hearing Request, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC Judgment Against: Edgar Barrera, Amount: $1,130.26, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Judgment For: MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC Judgment Against: Edgar Barrera, Amount: $140.80, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less