Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 02:24:28 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC VS Debra McDonald

Case Summary

On 02/02/2018 Midland Funding LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Debra McDonald. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Cecil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3511

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Cecil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Debra McDonald

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Staley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Pleadings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Judgment on Pleadings, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Notice of Service Re 26.1 Disclosure, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Judgment For: Midland Funding LLC Judgment Against: Debra McDonald, Amount: $666.75, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Judgment For: Midland Funding LLC Judgment Against: Debra McDonald, Amount: $147.00, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less