Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/15/2019 at 13:24:49 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC VS Debra Baird

Case Summary

On 10/07/2016 Midland Funding LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Debra Baird. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1007

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Debra Baird

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Bursey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Alternative Method of Service, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Judgment For: Midland Funding LLC Judgment Against: Debra Baird, Amount: $7,671.49, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Judgment For: Midland Funding LLC Judgment Against: Debra Baird, Amount: $187.40, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less