This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/01/2019 at 04:38:53 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC VS Carrie Gentry

Case Summary

On 12/21/2017 Midland Funding LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Carrie Gentry. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2648

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendants

Carrie Gentry

DAVID A GENTRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Leroy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Summary, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Summary Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: App/Deferral/Costs/Fees/Ser, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: e-mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Judgment For: Midland Funding LLC Judgment Against: Carrie Gentry Judgment Against: DAVID A GENTRY, Amount: $1,353.43, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Judgment For: Midland Funding LLC Judgment Against: Carrie Gentry Judgment Against: DAVID A GENTRY, Amount: $227.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less