Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 00:29:35 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC, A Foreign Entity VS Angie Padilla

Case Summary

On 01/30/2018 Midland Funding LLC, A Foreign Entity filed an Other lawsuit against Angie Padilla. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Cecil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1315

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Cecil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC, A Foreign Entity

Defendants

Angie Padilla

JOHN PADILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Leroy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Judgment For: Midland Funding LLC, A Foreign Entity Judgment Against: Angie Padilla Judgment Against: JOHN PADILLA, Amount: $610.73, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Judgment For: Midland Funding LLC, A Foreign Entity Judgment Against: Angie Padilla Judgment Against: JOHN PADILLA, Amount: $162.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less