This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 03/01/2021 at 09:32:00 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGMENT INC VS JANICE YAZZIE

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGMENT INC filed an Other lawsuit against JANICE YAZZIE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, South Mountain Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Williams, Cody. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1678

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Mountain Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Williams, Cody

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGMENT INC

Defendant

JANICE YAZZIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Schultz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Notice of Service Re 26.1 Disclosure, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less