This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/28/2019 at 02:36:08 (UTC).

MESA AIRLINES, INC. VS SIDNEY FLYNN

Case Summary

On 06/29/2017 MESA AIRLINES, INC filed an Other lawsuit against SIDNEY FLYNN. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0136

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MESA AIRLINES, INC.

Defendant

SIDNEY FLYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Weeks

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Accounting, Sub Type: Adjustment, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Telephone Call, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Judgment For: MESA AIRLINES, INC. Judgment Against: SIDNEY FLYNN, Amount: $6,982.23, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Judgment For: MESA AIRLINES, INC. Judgment Against: SIDNEY FLYNN, Amount: $96.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Judgment For: MESA AIRLINES, INC. Judgment Against: SIDNEY FLYNN, Amount: $1,396.45, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less