This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/28/2019 at 02:36:14 (UTC).

MESA AIRLINES, INC. VS MOHAMED OSMAN

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 MESA AIRLINES, INC filed an Other lawsuit against MOHAMED OSMAN. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0138

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MESA AIRLINES, INC.

Defendant

MOHAMED OSMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Weeks

Defendant Attorney

Richard Klauer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Reply, Sub Type: To Response, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Court, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Application for Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Notice of Service Re 26.1 Disclosure, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Reply, Sub Type: Counterclaim, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Summons, Sub Type: Issued, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Judgment For: MOHAMED OSMAN Judgment Against: MESA AIRLINES, INC., Amount: $5,560.00, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Judgment For: MOHAMED OSMAN Judgment Against: MESA AIRLINES, INC., Amount: $4,385.00, Type: Attorney Fee, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less