Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 00:48:20 (UTC).

MAXIMUM TITLE LOANS VS KEELY SUGANUMA

Case Summary

On 08/11/2017 MAXIMUM TITLE LOANS filed an Other lawsuit against KEELY SUGANUMA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Frankel, Keith and Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8507

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Frankel, Keith

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAXIMUM TITLE LOANS

Defendant

KEELY SUGANUMA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Notice of Hearing on Garnishment, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition for Order To Show Cause Re Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Amended, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Small Claims, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Judgment For: MAXIMUM TITLE LOANS Judgment Against: KEELY SUGANUMA, Amount: $0.00, Type: Total Judgment, Status: Modified

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Judgment For: MAXIMUM TITLE LOANS Judgment Against: KEELY SUGANUMA, Amount: $104.00, Type: Costs, Status: Modified

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Judgment For: MAXIMUM TITLE LOANS Judgment Against: KEELY SUGANUMA, Amount: $525.50, Type: Accrual, Status: Modified

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Judgment For: MAXIMUM TITLE LOANS Judgment Against: KEELY SUGANUMA, Amount: $150.00, Type: Undesignated, Status: Modified

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Judgment For: MAXIMUM TITLE LOANS Judgment Against: KEELY SUGANUMA, Amount: $666.00, Type: Principal, Status: Modified

    Read MoreRead Less