This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/26/2019 at 06:48:02 (UTC).

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. VS MCS ENTERPRICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC filed an Other lawsuit against MCS ENTERPRICES, LLC. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6079

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Defendant

MCS ENTERPRICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STANLEY HAMMERMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Non-Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Non-Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • , Status: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • , Status: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • , Status: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • , Status: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Judgment For: MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. Judgment Against: MCS ENTERPRICES, LLC, Amount: $9,492.11, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Judgment For: MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. Judgment Against: MCS ENTERPRICES, LLC, Amount: $279.88, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Judgment For: MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. Judgment Against: MCS ENTERPRICES, LLC, Amount: $750.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Judgment For: MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. Judgment Against: MCS ENTERPRICES, LLC, Amount: $286.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less