This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 01/30/2023 at 12:28:03 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS NATHAN CLAY

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against NATHAN CLAY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9938

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

NATHAN CLAY

Garnishee

VENSURE EMPLOYER SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wade Price

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Garnishment; Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Garnishment; Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien; Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Garnishment Creditor; Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Garnishee; Sub Type: Answer (Earnings); Result: Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Affidavit of Service; Sub Type: Garnishment Return; Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Garnishment Creditor; Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Judgment; Sub Type: Default; Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Judgement Against: NATHAN CLAY; Amount: $1,733.10; Type: Total Judgment; Status: Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Proof of Debt; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Request; Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Application for Entry of Default; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Order; Sub Type: Extend Time for Service; Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Affidavit of Service; Sub Type: Private Process; Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion; Sub Type: Alternative Service; Result: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: Complaint; Sub Type: Civil Complaint; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less