This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/26/2019 at 13:51:32 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS JESSIE COLLINS

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JESSIE COLLINS. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2356

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JESSIE COLLINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Guglielmo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Judgment For: LVNV FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: JESSIE COLLINS, Amount: $2,528.42, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Judgment For: LVNV FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: JESSIE COLLINS, Amount: $146.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less