Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/28/2019 at 10:54:11 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS CHRISTY SUE FREEMAN

Case Summary

On 07/17/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CHRISTY SUE FREEMAN. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0404

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

CHRISTY SUE FREEMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Guglielmo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Judgment For: LVNV FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: CHRISTY SUE FREEMAN, Amount: $925.87, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Judgment For: LVNV FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: CHRISTY SUE FREEMAN, Amount: $146.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less