This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 21:07:20 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS CHELSEA GENDUSO

Case Summary

On 09/18/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CHELSEA GENDUSO. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5060

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

CHELSEA GENDUSO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Guglielmo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Alternative Method of Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Judgment For: LVNV FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: CHELSEA GENDUSO, Amount: $824.60, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Judgment For: LVNV FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: CHELSEA GENDUSO, Amount: $216.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Judgment For: LVNV FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: CHELSEA GENDUSO, Amount: $300.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less