Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/31/2019 at 00:32:24 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS ALMA GONZALES

Case Summary

On 11/03/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ALMA GONZALES. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8307

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ALMA GONZALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Guglielmo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Alternative Method of Service, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Judgment For: LVNV FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: ALMA GONZALES, Amount: $599.94, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Judgment For: LVNV FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: ALMA GONZALES, Amount: $203.88, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less