This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/20/2019 at 16:35:09 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORPORATION VS DEMETRA WOMACK

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 LOBEL FINANCIAL CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against DEMETRA WOMACK. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9477

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Defendants

DEMETRA WOMACK

BRIANCE WOMACK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth Seidberg

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Judgment For: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORPORATION Judgment Against: DEMETRA WOMACK Judgment Against: BRIANCE WOMACK, Amount: $7,794.35, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Judgment For: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORPORATION Judgment Against: DEMETRA WOMACK Judgment Against: BRIANCE WOMACK, Amount: $219.60, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Judgment For: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORPORATION Judgment Against: DEMETRA WOMACK Judgment Against: BRIANCE WOMACK, Amount: $395.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less