Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/14/2019 at 11:49:51 (UTC).

LAS HACIENDAS DE PARDISE VILLAGE ASSOCIATION VS HEATH GERONDALE

Case Summary

On 08/26/2016 LAS HACIENDAS DE PARDISE VILLAGE ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against HEATH GERONDALE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3377

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAS HACIENDAS DE PARDISE VILLAGE ASSOCIATION

Defendant

HEATH GERONDALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Troy Stratman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Judgment For: LAS HACIENDAS DE PARDISE VILLAGE ASSOCIATION Judgment Against: HEATH GERONDALE, Amount: $5,099.50, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Judgment For: LAS HACIENDAS DE PARDISE VILLAGE ASSOCIATION Judgment Against: HEATH GERONDALE, Amount: $313.60, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Judgment For: LAS HACIENDAS DE PARDISE VILLAGE ASSOCIATION Judgment Against: HEATH GERONDALE, Amount: $720.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less