This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 02/26/2021 at 10:58:49 (UTC).

LAS GARDENIAS APARTMENTS, LP VS ADRIENNE PINEDA Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 LAS GARDENIAS APARTMENTS, LP filed an Other lawsuit against ADRIENNE PINEDA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Country Meadows Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Huberman, Anna. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1609

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Country Meadows Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Huberman, Anna

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAS GARDENIAS APARTMENTS, LP

Defendants

ANGELICA GARCIA

ADRIENNE PINEDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Clark

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy Bojanowski

Louis Camp

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Complaint, Sub Type: Eviction Action Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less