Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 01:05:01 (UTC).

LARRY L MOORE VS RUSH BAHTKA Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2018 LARRY L MOORE filed an Other lawsuit against RUSH BAHTKA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Cecil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2043

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Cecil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LARRY L MOORE

Defendants

RUSH BAHTKA

SUPER 8

KUSH BAHTKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Elias

John Crotty

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismissal With Prejudice, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation, Sub Type: Dismiss With Prejudice, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Substitution, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Accelerate Hearing, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Constable, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Constable, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less