This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/12/2019 at 10:13:19 (UTC).

LARRY A JONES VS DELIA D LANDEVERDE

Case Summary

On 06/14/2016 LARRY A JONES filed an Other lawsuit against DELIA D LANDEVERDE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5369

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LARRY A JONES

Defendant

DELIA D LANDEVERDE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Court, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Continuance - Small Claims, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Telephone Call, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Small Claims Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Small Claims, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Judgment For: LARRY A JONES Judgment Against: DELIA D LANDEVERDE, Amount: $1,931.00, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less