Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/13/2019 at 00:52:07 (UTC).

LANDINGS CREDIT UNION VS RAY R GONZALES

Case Summary

On 07/08/2016 LANDINGS CREDIT UNION filed an Other lawsuit against RAY R GONZALES. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1112

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANDINGS CREDIT UNION

Defendant

RAY R GONZALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tara Miller

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Publication, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Publication, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Judgment For: LANDINGS CREDIT UNION Judgment Against: RAY R GONZALES, Amount: $1,659.36, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Judgment For: LANDINGS CREDIT UNION Judgment Against: RAY R GONZALES, Amount: $400.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Judgment For: LANDINGS CREDIT UNION Judgment Against: RAY R GONZALES, Amount: $416.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less