This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/30/2019 at 11:29:59 (UTC).

KINO FINANCIAL CO., LLC VS MICHAEL J FORNEY

Case Summary

On 10/13/2017 KINO FINANCIAL CO , LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MICHAEL J FORNEY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3586

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINO FINANCIAL CO., LLC

Defendant

MICHAEL J FORNEY

Garnishee

US POSTAL SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Leroy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Release Of Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Application for Attorney Fees, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Judgment For: KINO FINANCIAL CO., LLC Judgment Against: MICHAEL J FORNEY, Amount: $1,469.79, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Judgment For: KINO FINANCIAL CO., LLC Judgment Against: MICHAEL J FORNEY, Amount: $162.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Judgment For: KINO FINANCIAL CO., LLC Judgment Against: MICHAEL J FORNEY, Amount: $522.12, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less