This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 05/02/2020 at 12:53:26 (UTC).

KINO FINANCIAL CO LLC VS MARGARET CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 KINO FINANCIAL CO LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MARGARET CHAVEZ. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, University Lakes Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kissell, Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5979

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    University Lakes Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kissell, Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINO FINANCIAL CO LLC

Defendant

MARGARET CHAVEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Leroy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: KINO FINANCIAL CO LLC Judgment Against: MARGARET CHAVEZ, Amount: $1,438.26, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: KINO FINANCIAL CO LLC Judgment Against: MARGARET CHAVEZ, Amount: $166.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: KINO FINANCIAL CO LLC Judgment Against: MARGARET CHAVEZ, Amount: $467.63, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.