This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 04/09/2021 at 05:38:21 (UTC).

KINO FINANCIAL CO., LLC VS MANUEL FLORES

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 KINO FINANCIAL CO , LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MANUEL FLORES. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, West Mcdowell Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ramirez Lopez, Teresa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1694

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ramirez Lopez, Teresa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINO FINANCIAL CO., LLC

Defendant

MANUEL FLORES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Leroy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: KINO FINANCIAL CO., LLC Judgment Against: MANUEL FLORES, Amount: $7,103.14, Type: Principal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: KINO FINANCIAL CO., LLC Judgment Against: MANUEL FLORES, Amount: $231.00, Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: KINO FINANCIAL CO., LLC Judgment Against: MANUEL FLORES, Amount: $500.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Application for Attorney Fees, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less