Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/14/2019 at 12:23:12 (UTC).

JUDITH OSUAGWU VS SIGUE MONEY TRANSFER SERVICES

Case Summary

On 08/29/2016 JUDITH OSUAGWU filed an Other lawsuit against SIGUE MONEY TRANSFER SERVICES. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4310

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUDITH OSUAGWU

Defendant

SIGUE MONEY TRANSFER SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

William Black

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismissal With Prejudice, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation, Sub Type: Dismiss With Prejudice, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismissal, Result: Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Joint ADR Statement, Sub Type: Settlement Reached, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: JCRCP Rule 121, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less