This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/26/2019 at 09:18:57 (UTC).

JUAN RUBIO VS DWAYNE NEMETH

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 JUAN RUBIO filed an Other lawsuit against DWAYNE NEMETH. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8438

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUAN RUBIO

Defendant

DWAYNE NEMETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Manuel Garibay

Defendant Attorney

Brett Donaldson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismissal With Prejudice, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation, Sub Type: Dismiss With Prejudice, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Settlement, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Withdraw, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Withdraw, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Jury, Sub Type: Demand, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Publication, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less