This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 12/01/2019 at 16:46:07 (UTC).

JOHN J WEEDO VS DIANE CZERNICKI Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 JOHN J WEEDO filed an Other lawsuit against DIANE CZERNICKI. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Mcdowell Mountain Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Reagan, Michele. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5449

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Reagan, Michele

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN J WEEDO

Defendants

TIFFANY DAVIS

LEE MILLER

TOM ALBERTE

JANICE SMOLINISKI

HOMES BY TOWNE

DIANE CZERNICKI

WENDY KELLERHER

DORI WANITSCHKE

FRED FERENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Alexis Firehawk

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Order of Transfer, Sub Type: Civil Division, Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal With Prejudice, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Certified/Registered Mail, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Certified/Registered Mail, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Certified/Registered Mail, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Certified/Registered Mail, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Certified/Registered Mail, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Certified/Registered Mail, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Certified/Registered Mail, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Certified/Registered Mail, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Dismiss, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Transfer, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Small Claims, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less