This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 09:42:35 (UTC).

John A Liebert M.D., P.C. VS Sonali Gangadean

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 John A Liebert M D , P C filed an Other lawsuit against Sonali Gangadean. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1610

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John A Liebert M.D., P.C.

Defendant

Sonali Gangadean

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Kozub

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Publication, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Publication, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Tickler, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Certified/Registered Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Judgment For: John A Liebert M.D., P.C. Judgment Against: Sonali Gangadean, Amount: $3,868.34, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Judgment For: John A Liebert M.D., P.C. Judgment Against: Sonali Gangadean, Amount: $3,422.50, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Judgment For: John A Liebert M.D., P.C. Judgment Against: Sonali Gangadean, Amount: $216.56, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.