Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/08/2019 at 02:02:52 (UTC).

JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC VS AMBER CONLEY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2016 JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against AMBER CONLEY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1408

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC

Defendant

AMBER CONLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Logvin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Attorneys Fees, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Joint ADR Statement, Sub Type: No Settlement Reached, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Notice of Service Re 26.1 Disclosure, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Judgment For: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC Judgment Against: AMBER CONLEY, Amount: $1,771.56, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Judgment For: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC Judgment Against: AMBER CONLEY, Amount: $660.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Judgment For: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES LLC Judgment Against: AMBER CONLEY, Amount: $296.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less