This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 02/19/2020 at 12:08:09 (UTC).

JEFFERSON TOWN LAKE APTS. LLC. P VS ABDULLA ALBABI Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 JEFFERSON TOWN LAKE APTS LLC P filed an Other lawsuit against ABDULLA ALBABI. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, University Lakes Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kissell, Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4999

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    University Lakes Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kissell, Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON TOWN LAKE APTS. LLC. P

Defendants

ALI HUMAID ALBADI

ABDULLA ALBABI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Clark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Imaged Case File, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Judgment For: JEFFERSON TOWN LAKE APTS. LLC. P Judgment Against: ALI HUMAID ALBADI Judgment Against: ABDULLA ALBABI, Amount: $4,143.26, Type: Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Judgment For: JEFFERSON TOWN LAKE APTS. LLC. P Judgment Against: ALI HUMAID ALBADI Judgment Against: ABDULLA ALBABI, Amount: $300.00, Type: Late Charge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Judgment For: JEFFERSON TOWN LAKE APTS. LLC. P Judgment Against: ALI HUMAID ALBADI Judgment Against: ABDULLA ALBABI, Amount: $3,107.45, Type: Concessions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Judgment For: JEFFERSON TOWN LAKE APTS. LLC. P Judgment Against: ALI HUMAID ALBADI Judgment Against: ABDULLA ALBABI, Amount: $79.27, Type: Utilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Judgment For: JEFFERSON TOWN LAKE APTS. LLC. P Judgment Against: ALI HUMAID ALBADI Judgment Against: ABDULLA ALBABI, Amount: $98.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Judgment For: JEFFERSON TOWN LAKE APTS. LLC. P Judgment Against: ALI HUMAID ALBADI Judgment Against: ABDULLA ALBABI, Amount: $100.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.