This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/26/2019 at 12:47:03 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC VS ANDREW BEGAY

Case Summary

On 05/04/2017 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ANDREW BEGAY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1490

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

Defendants

ANDREW BEGAY

ROBIN BEGAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tyson Cullimore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Sum certain affidavit, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Pending Dismissal of Lawsuit, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Amended Caption, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Judgment For: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC Judgment Against: ANDREW BEGAY Judgment Against: ROBIN BEGAY, Amount: $5,569.28, Type: Principal, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Judgment For: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC Judgment Against: ANDREW BEGAY Judgment Against: ROBIN BEGAY, Amount: $163.50, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less