This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 00:32:48 (UTC).

JASON E RAPPAPORT VS KRISTEN GUTHERIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2017 JASON E RAPPAPORT filed an Other lawsuit against KRISTEN GUTHERIE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8234

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JASON E RAPPAPORT

Defendants

KRISTEN GUTHERIE

ROBERT GUTHRIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Moring

Defendant Attorney

Mike Abel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Non-Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Satisfaction against Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Non-Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Counterclaim, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer and Counterclaim, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Dismiss, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Dismiss, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Transfer From Small Claims to Civil, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Judgment For: ROBERT GUTHRIE Judgment For: KRISTEN GUTHERIE Judgment Against: JASON E RAPPAPORT, Amount: $66.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Judgment For: ROBERT GUTHRIE Judgment For: KRISTEN GUTHERIE Judgment Against: JASON E RAPPAPORT, Amount: $2,655.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.