This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 12:21:28 (UTC).

JANET HELMUTH Et Al VS MELANIE BEHM

Case Summary

On 09/01/2017 JANET HELMUTH filed an Other lawsuit against MELANIE BEHM. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3885

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JANET HELMUTH

HOMER HELMUTH

Defendant

MELANIE BEHM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Tucker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Accounting, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Ruling - Superior Court, Sub Type: Affirms Ruling, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Accounting, Sub Type: Bond Disposition, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Ruling - Superior Court, Sub Type: Affirms Ruling, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Transmittal of Record, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Transmittal of Record to Superior Court, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Notice of, Sub Type: Initial Perfection, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Appellee, Sub Type: Memoranda Response, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Appellant, Sub Type: Designation of Record, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Notice of, Sub Type: Appeal, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Exhibit, Sub Type: Entered, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Notice of, Sub Type: Right to Appeal, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Trial Date, Result: Trial Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Complaint, Sub Type: Amended Complaint, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Judgment For: HOMER HELMUTH Judgment For: JANET HELMUTH Judgment Against: MELANIE BEHM, Amount: $1,505.00, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.