This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 12/01/2019 at 09:51:05 (UTC).

IRVINE PARK PARTNERS II VS ANDERSON TATE Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 IRVINE PARK PARTNERS II filed an Other lawsuit against ANDERSON TATE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Arcadia Biltmore Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Driggs, Leonore. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2935

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Driggs, Leonore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IRVINE PARK PARTNERS II

Defendants

STEPHEN TATE

ANDERSON TATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Clark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Vacate, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Set Aside, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketJudgment For: IRVINE PARK PARTNERS II Judgment Against: ANDERSON TATE Judgment Against: STEPHEN TATE, Amount: $925.00, Type: Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketJudgment For: IRVINE PARK PARTNERS II Judgment Against: ANDERSON TATE Judgment Against: STEPHEN TATE, Amount: $98.00, Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketJudgment For: IRVINE PARK PARTNERS II Judgment Against: ANDERSON TATE Judgment Against: STEPHEN TATE, Amount: $90.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less