This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/01/2019 at 02:49:43 (UTC).

INVESTORS MANAGEMENT TRUST REAL ESTATE GROUP INC VS HEATHER DAVIS

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 INVESTORS MANAGEMENT TRUST REAL ESTATE GROUP INC filed an Other lawsuit against HEATHER DAVIS. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0377

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTORS MANAGEMENT TRUST REAL ESTATE GROUP INC

Defendant

HEATHER DAVIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Koglmeier

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Minute Entry Issued, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Exhibit, Sub Type: Entered, Result: Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Notice of, Sub Type: Right to Appeal, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Eviction Action Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Trial Date, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Judgment For: INVESTORS MANAGEMENT TRUST REAL ESTATE GROUP INC Judgment Against: HEATHER DAVIS, Amount: $602.22, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less