This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/28/2019 at 01:40:36 (UTC).

INCOM APARTMENTS, LLC VS MECHELLE EATON

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 INCOM APARTMENTS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MECHELLE EATON. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9053

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INCOM APARTMENTS, LLC

Defendant

MECHELLE EATON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Hull

Garren Laymon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Judgment For: INCOM APARTMENTS, LLC Judgment Against: MECHELLE EATON, Amount: $2,048.00, Type: Rent, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Judgment For: INCOM APARTMENTS, LLC Judgment Against: MECHELLE EATON, Amount: $300.00, Type: Late Charge, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Judgment For: INCOM APARTMENTS, LLC Judgment Against: MECHELLE EATON, Amount: $105.00, Type: Costs, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Judgment For: INCOM APARTMENTS, LLC Judgment Against: MECHELLE EATON, Amount: $60.00, Type: Attorney Fee, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Judgment For: INCOM APARTMENTS, LLC Judgment Against: MECHELLE EATON, Amount: ($0.39), Type: Previous Balance, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Judgment For: INCOM APARTMENTS, LLC Judgment Against: MECHELLE EATON, Amount: $1,595.92, Type: Concessions, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Judgment For: INCOM APARTMENTS, LLC Judgment Against: MECHELLE EATON, Amount: $51.15, Type: Notice Fees, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less