This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 01/06/2020 at 10:27:08 (UTC).

GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT VS SALEH ALQADDAN

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT filed an Other lawsuit against SALEH ALQADDAN. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, University Lakes Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kissell, Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6029

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    University Lakes Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kissell, Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT

Defendant

SALEH ALQADDAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Koglmeier

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Imaged Case File, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Judgment For: GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT Judgment Against: SALEH ALQADDAN Jr., Amount: $4,211.60, Type: Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Judgment For: GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT Judgment Against: SALEH ALQADDAN Jr., Amount: $245.00, Type: Late Charge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Judgment For: GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT Judgment Against: SALEH ALQADDAN Jr., Amount: $108.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Judgment For: GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT Judgment Against: SALEH ALQADDAN Jr., Amount: $130.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Judgment For: GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT Judgment Against: SALEH ALQADDAN Jr., Amount: $10.26, Type: Utilities

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.