This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 05:52:55 (UTC).

Gerald D Sherrill VS Marie Ralston

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 Gerald D Sherrill filed an Other lawsuit against Marie Ralston. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7800

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gerald D Sherrill

Defendant

Marie Ralston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gerald Sherrill

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Exhibit, Sub Type: Filed, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Exhibit, Sub Type: Filed, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Exhibit, Sub Type: Filed, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Notice of, Sub Type: Right to Appeal, Result: Accepted/Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Continue Trial, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: List of Witnesses/Exhibits, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Not Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Trial, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Joint ADR Statement, Sub Type: No Settlement Reached, Result: No Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Alternative Method of Service, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Judgment For: Gerald D Sherrill Judgment Against: Marie Ralston, Amount: $5,474.55, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Judgment For: Gerald D Sherrill Judgment Against: Marie Ralston, Amount: $127.50, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.