Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 01:13:06 (UTC).

GC PARK VILLAGE LLC Et Al VS JAMES HOLIDAY Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2018 GC PARK VILLAGE LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JAMES HOLIDAY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Cecil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2245

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Cecil

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GC PARK VILLAGE LLC

PARK VILLAGE APTS

US COLLECTIONS WEST INC

Apartment Management Consultans LLC dba Lindsay Palms

Defendants

JAMES HOLIDAY

VICTOR CLAYCOMB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradley Coleman

Alan Zimmerman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: No Action

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Assignment of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Assignment of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Imaged Case File, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Judgment For: PARK VILLAGE APTS Judgment For: GC PARK VILLAGE LLC Judgment Against: JAMES HOLIDAY Judgment Against: VICTOR CLAYCOMB, Amount: $2,626.90, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less