This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 05/06/2020 at 10:32:45 (UTC).

GARY ULRICH Et Al VS KATIE HILL Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2019 GARY ULRICH filed an Other lawsuit against KATIE HILL. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Mcdowell Mountain Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Reagan, Michele. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5916

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Reagan, Michele

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARY ULRICH

KATHY ULRICH

Defendants

KATIE HILL

VAN HILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J Heldenbrand

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Constable, Result: No Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Default Judgment And Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • JudgementJudgment For: GARY ULRICH Judgment For: KATHY ULRICH Judgment Against: VAN HILL Judgment Against: KATIE HILL, Amount: $5,392.76, Type: Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • JudgementJudgment For: GARY ULRICH Judgment For: KATHY ULRICH Judgment Against: VAN HILL Judgment Against: KATIE HILL, Amount: $320.00, Type: Late Charge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • JudgementJudgment For: GARY ULRICH Judgment For: KATHY ULRICH Judgment Against: VAN HILL Judgment Against: KATIE HILL, Amount: $110.00, Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • JudgementJudgment For: GARY ULRICH Judgment For: KATHY ULRICH Judgment Against: VAN HILL Judgment Against: KATIE HILL, Amount: $160.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less