This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/04/2019 at 08:53:02 (UTC).

FAMILY LOAN COMPANY, INC. VS CORY WAYNE MICHAEL HAMMOND

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 FAMILY LOAN COMPANY, INC filed an Other lawsuit against CORY WAYNE MICHAEL HAMMOND. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3500

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAMILY LOAN COMPANY, INC.

Defendant

CORY WAYNE MICHAEL HAMMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mikki Yitzchaki

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Alternative Method of Service, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Judgment For: FAMILY LOAN COMPANY, INC. Judgment Against: CORY WAYNE MICHAEL HAMMOND, Amount: $4,338.76, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Judgment For: FAMILY LOAN COMPANY, INC. Judgment Against: CORY WAYNE MICHAEL HAMMOND, Amount: $4,103.19, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Judgment For: FAMILY LOAN COMPANY, INC. Judgment Against: CORY WAYNE MICHAEL HAMMOND, Amount: $500.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Judgment For: FAMILY LOAN COMPANY, INC. Judgment Against: CORY WAYNE MICHAEL HAMMOND, Amount: $210.04, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less