This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 02/02/2020 at 11:47:07 (UTC).

EZ OWN AUTO SOURCE VS ELISHEA NORRIS

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 EZ OWN AUTO SOURCE filed an Other lawsuit against ELISHEA NORRIS. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, University Lakes Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kissell, Tyler. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5181

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    University Lakes Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kissell, Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EZ OWN AUTO SOURCE

Defendant

ELISHEA NORRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Waldron

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.