This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 06:09:58 (UTC).

Esther Lover VS Jose Avila

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 Esther Lover filed an Other lawsuit against Jose Avila. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Reagan, Michael and Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8172

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Reagan, Michael

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Esther Lover

Defendant

Jose Avila

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Hull

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Pending Dismissal of Lawsuit, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order of Transfer Out, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order of Transfer Out, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order of Transfer, Sub Type: Civil Division, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Change of Judge for Right, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Attempted Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Transfer From Small Claims to Civil, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Judgment For: Esther Lover Judgment Against: Jose Avila, Amount: $2,875.00, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.